Pitts v. Goodman Acker P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Henrietta Pitts
Defendant: Goodman Acker P.C. and Robert Half International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10829
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENTING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, AND #11 MOTION to Dismiss:(Plaintiff's Response due by 8/8/2019) - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading, #16 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Henrietta Pitts at 20117 Stratford, Detroit, MI 48221 - (CCie)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Requiring Response to #14 Motion for Judgment - Response due by 7/18/2019 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Requiring Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss - Response due by 7/9/2019 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Goodman Acker P.C.. (Brouwer, Deborah)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Robert Half International, Inc. (O'Connor, Felicia)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Kopp on behalf of Robert Half International, Inc.. (Kopp, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Half International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (O'Connor, Felicia)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Goodman Acker P.C. (Brouwer, Deborah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Goodman Acker P.C.. (Brouwer, Deborah)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
April 1, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Henrietta Pitts AT 20117 Stratford, Detroit MI 48221. (DTof)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 29, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Henrietta Pitts at 20117 Stratford,Detroit, MI 48221. (DTof)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLETE SERVICE DOCUMENTSAND FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE U.S. MARSHAL. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Henrietta Pitts. (SOso)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Henrietta Pitts against All Defendants (SOso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Goodman Acker P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Acker P.C.
Represented By: Deborah L. Brouwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Half International, Inc.
Represented By: Felicia S. O'Connor
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?