Fraser Investment Properties, LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Fraser Investment Properties, LLC
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10834
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Staying Case and Appraisal Protocol. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
April 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2019. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (DPar)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Meyer, Kurt)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference Reset for 4/30/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. (DPar)
April 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 4/24/2019 is Cancelled re #4 Order. (DPar)
March 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 216 before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Answer to Complaint by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company Amended Certificate correcting attorney's names (Meyer, Kurt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Meyer, Kurt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 19-0638-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7163232 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Annual Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email 02.28.2019, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Damages) (Meyer, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraser Investment Properties, LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraser Investment Properties, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?