State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Precious Physical Therapy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp., Hansee Sesi, Payal Hemal Bhagat, Khalid Gazguz, Salwa Elia, Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat, Core Physical Therapy Corp. and Precious Physical Therapy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10835
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Allen, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Attorney David D. O'Brien to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Khalid Gazguz* (DWor)
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Khalid Gazguz by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Heck, Jared)
June 21, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William A. Calunas appearing on behalf of Hansee Sesi (Calunas, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Khalid Gazguz served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (O'Brien, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Peterson on behalf of Hansee Sesi. (Peterson, Andrew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Hansee Sesi. (Peterson, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Precious Physical Therapy, Inc.* (DWor)
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp.* (DWor)
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Precious Physical Therapy, Inc. by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Heck, Jared)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp. by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Heck, Jared)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #24 Motion for Default, and #25 Motion Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Precious Physical Therapy, Inc. by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David OBrien In Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - Resignation of Resident Agent for Precious Physical Therapy, Inc., filed with MI LARA on August 25, 2017) (Heck, Jared)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp. by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David OBrien In Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - 2017 Annual Report of Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp., filed with MI LARA on May 11, 2017, #4 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of David Koetsier, dated April 2, 2019) (Heck, Jared) Modified on 5/21/2019 (JMcC). [DOCUMENT TITLED - PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT STERLING PHYSICAL THERAPY PROVIDER CORP.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Core Physical Therapy Corp. (Joelson, Peter)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat, Payal Hemal Bhagat, Core Physical Therapy Corp., Salwa Elia. (Joelson, Peter)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hansee Sesi served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (O'Brien, David)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Alternate Service on Defendants Gazguz and Sesi by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of David Koetsier) (O'Brien, David)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Core Physical Therapy Corp., Hemal Kumar Madhusudan Bhagat, Payal Hemal Bhagat and Salwa Elia to Respond to #1 Complaint.( Responsive pleading due by 5/17/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary R. Blumberg on behalf of Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat, Payal Hemal Bhagat, Core Physical Therapy Corp., Salwa Elia. (Blumberg, Gary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Warren on behalf of Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat, Payal Hemal Bhagat, Core Physical Therapy Corp., Salwa Elia. (Warren, Emily)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat, Payal Hemal Bhagat, Core Physical Therapy Corp., Salwa Elia. (Joelson, Peter)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Precious Physical Therapy, Inc. served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Salwa Elia served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Payal Hemal Bhagat served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Core Physical Therapy Corp. served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (O'Brien, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Precious Physical Therapy, Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (O'Brien, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Powers on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Powers, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross O. Silverman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Silverman, Ross)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Heck, Jared)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. O'Brien on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (O'Brien, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cranmer, Thomas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7163382 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: McLean County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Treatment Appendix, #3 Exhibit 2A - Precious/Sterling Initial Exam Appendix (1 of 2), #4 Exhibit 2B - Precious/Sterling Initial Exam Appendix (2 of 2), #5 Exhibit 3A - Core Initial Exam Appendix (1 of 2), #6 Exhibit 3B - Core Initial Exam Appendix (2 of 2), #7 Exhibit 4 - Bhagat Plea Agreement, #8 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Payal Bhagat 12/1/17 Deposition, #9 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Payal Bhagat 2/1/17 Deposition, #10 Exhibit 7 - Sterling Articles of Incorporation, #11 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Salwa Elia 5/17/18 Deposition, #12 Exhibit 9 - Sample Precious Initial Exams, #13 Exhibit 10 - Sample Sterling Initial Exams, #14 Exhibit 11 - Patient M.M. Sterling Initial Exam, #15 Exhibit 12 - Patient S.A. Sterling Medical Exam, #16 Exhibit 13 - Patient O.B. Sterling Exam and Treatment Notes, #17 Exhibit 14 - Sample Core Initial Exams and Plans of Care, #18 Exhibit 15 - Patient S.S. Core Initial Exam, #19 Exhibit 16 - Patient S.I. Medical Exam Report, #20 Exhibit 17 - Core Initial Exams for S.S. and H.Y., #21 Exhibit 18 - Sterling Re-Evaluation Exam and Core Initial Exam for Patient S.N., #22 Exhibit 19 - Patient G.L. Precious Initial Exam, #23 Exhibit 20 - Sample Precious Treatment/Progress Notes, #24 Exhibit 21 - Sample Sterling Treatment/Progress Notes, #25 Exhibit 22 - Sample Core Daily Notes, #26 Exhibit 23 - Sample Precious Re-Evaluation Exams, #27 Exhibit 24 - Sample Sterling Re-Evaluation Exams, #28 Exhibit 25 - Sample Core Re-Evaluation Exams, #29 Exhibit 26 - Core Initial Exam and Discharge Summary for Patient S.T., #30 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from Patient M.K. 2/12/18 Deposition, #31 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from 9/28/16 Exam Under Oath of Patient M.J., #32 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from 9/29/16 Exam Under Oath of Patient M.H., #33 Exhibit 30 - Excerpts from 8/7/17 Exam Under Oath of Patient N.Y., #34 Exhibit 31 - Sample Precious Bills, #35 Exhibit 32 - Sample Sterling Bills, #36 Exhibit 33 - Sample Core Bills) (Heck, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Precious Physical Therapy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Physical Therapy Provider Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansee Sesi
Represented By: William A. Calunas
Represented By: Andrew G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payal Hemal Bhagat
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khalid Gazguz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salwa Elia
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hemalkumar Madhusudan Bhagat
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Physical Therapy Corp.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precious Physical Therapy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Michael J. Powers
Represented By: David D. O'Brien
Represented By: Jared T. Heck
Represented By: Ross O. Silverman
Represented By: Matthew P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?