B&G Towing LLC et al v. City of Detroit

Plaintiff: Joan Fiore, B&G Towing LLC, Javion and Sam's 24 Hour Towing Service, Inc, Citywide Towing Inc, Anthony Thomas and Paul Ott
Defendant: City of Detroit
Case Number: 2:2019cv10853
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
2 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs a Sur-reply on Federal Wiretap Act Claim. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court will schedule a Rule 16 scheduling conference, if needed, following resolution of #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Detroit. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal of Certain Claims; and Dismissal of B&G Towing and Anthony Thomas as party Plaintiffs, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by B&G Towing LLC, Anthony Thomas (Fraser, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Deldin on behalf of B&G Towing LLC, Anthony Thomas. (Deldin, Marc)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Unopposed David Fraser by B&G Towing LLC, Anthony Thomas. (Fraser, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to #8 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Notice of Filing Supplemental Legal Authority, RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Fraser, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bressack, Darryl)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by City of Detroit re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bressack, Darryl)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by B&G Towing LLC, Citywide Towing Inc, Joan Fiore, Javion and Sam's 24 Hour Towing Service, Inc, Paul Ott, Anthony Thomas. (Fraser, David)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DETERMINATION OF #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Detroit. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Detroit. (Bressack, Darryl)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Declining to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction over State Law Claims. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (NAhm)
March 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of City of Detroit. (Bressack, Darryl)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Detroit from Circuit Court of Wayne County, case number 19-002351. Receipt No: 0645-7166045 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 18-cv-11565, Judge Michelson] (Mack, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&G Towing LLC et al v. City of Detroit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Fiore
Represented By: David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&G Towing LLC
Represented By: Marc A. Deldin
Represented By: David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javion and Sam's 24 Hour Towing Service, Inc
Represented By: David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citywide Towing Inc
Represented By: David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Thomas
Represented By: Marc A. Deldin
Represented By: David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ott
Represented By: David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Detroit
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?