ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC v. ZIMMER et al

Plaintiff: ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC
Defendant: KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC, NEIL ZIMMER and ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10880
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice S. McQueen on behalf of NEIL ZIMMER. (McQueen, Janice)
April 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION TO EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (JCur)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by NEIL ZIMMER. (Marsh, Daniel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC, KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Neil Zimmer, #3 Exhibit 2 02/22/19 Letter to K. Turnball) (Vincent, William)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William J. Vincent appearing on behalf of ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC, KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC (Vincent, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. NEIL ZIMMER served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathrine F. Wenger on behalf of ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC. (Wenger, Cathrine)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *NEIL ZIMMER* (DWor)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC* (DWor)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC* (DWor)
March 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
March 26, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC against ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC, KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC, NEIL ZIMMER with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7168683 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: OUT OF STATE - County Where Action Arose: MACOMB - County of 1st Defendant: OUT OF STATE. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Sweitzer, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC v. ZIMMER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Cathrine F. Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINGSWERE FURNITURE LLC
Represented By: William J. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL ZIMMER
Represented By: Janice S. McQueen
Represented By: Daniel P. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC
Represented By: William J. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?