General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc. v. McAfee's Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Benjamin R. McAfee and McAfee's Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11016
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Vacating #10 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc. and Certificate of Service by General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Contract Document, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kraig Wilson, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2017 Economics of Law Practice Report and the 2018 Directory of Michigans Largest Law Firms, #5 Exhibit 4 - Attorney Web Bios, #6 Exhibit 5 - Attorney Invoice) (Schwartz, Stuart)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 7/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *McAfee's Communications, Inc.* (NAhm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Benjamin R. McAfee* (NAhm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Benjamin R. McAfee by General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to McAfee's Communications, Inc. by General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. McAfee's Communications, Inc. served on 4/28/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Schwartz, Stuart)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Benjamin R. McAfee served on 4/28/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Schwartz, Stuart)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *McAfee's Communications, Inc.* (DWor)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Benjamin R. McAfee* (DWor)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7187485 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Mercer County, OH. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schwartz, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc. v. McAfee's Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin R. McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAfee's Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?