Euesden v. Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association
Plaintiff: Alice Euesden
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association
Case Number: 2:2019cv11059
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Extending Time for Defendant to file Optional Reply Brief, ( Response due by 8/12/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Extending Time for Defendant to File Optional Reply Brief, ( Response due by 7/11/2019, Reply due 8/10/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and Setting Aside Stay of Foreclosure Sale and Denying Defendant's #12 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2019 re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alice Euesden Disposition: Motion denied (Court Reporter: Merilyn Jones) (TMcg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Reedy v. Rich Transp, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Findling v. Int'l Transmission Co., #4 Exhibit C - United States v. Gordon, #5 Exhibit D - Payment history, #6 Exhibit E - Mortgage statement, #7 Exhibit F - Mortgage statement, #8 Exhibit G - Mortgage statement, #9 Exhibit H - Certification) (Baucus, Laura)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alice Euesden. (Peck, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Staying Sheriff's Sale and Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: #1 Notice of Removal, :(Reply due by 5/20/2019, Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association by Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association (E.D. Mich. LR 7.1(a) Concurrence Correction) (Baucus, Laura)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases, #3 Exhibit B - 2003 Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Discharge of Mortgage) (Baucus, Laura)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases, #3 Exhibit B - 2003 Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Discharge of Mortgage) (Baucus, Laura)
May 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Response due by 5/14/2019 (TMcg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Alice Euesden. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation) (Peck, Thomas)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to File First Responsive Pleading re #1 Notice of Removal, ( Response due by 5/14/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah S. Hazimi on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Hazimi, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Correction re 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (SKra)
April 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 19-001280-CH. Receipt #0645-7194404 Fee: $400. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Exterior-Only Inspection Residential Appraisal Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Baucus, Laura) Modified on 4/12/2019 (SKra). Modified on 4/12/2019 (SKra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Euesden v. Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Euesden
Represented By: Thomas G. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association
Represented By: Sarah S. Hazimi
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?