Sulier v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle Sulier
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv11078
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT of Social Security Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Admin Record - 002, #2 Document Continuation Admin Record - 003, #3 Document Continuation Admin Record - 004, #4 Document Continuation Admin Record - 005, #5 Document Continuation Admin Record - 006, #6 Document Continuation Admin Record - 007, #7 Document Continuation Admin Record - 008, #8 Document Continuation Admin Record - 009, #9 Document Continuation Admin Record - 010) (Mays, Vanessa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Mays, Vanessa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 05/07/2019. (Phillips, Randall)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly E. Carter on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Carter, Molly)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 05/07/2019. (Phillips, Randall)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Phillips, Randall)
April 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (DAll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Michelle Sulier. (Phillips, Randall)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW filed by Michelle Sulier against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lenawee - County Where Action Arose: Lenawee - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Phillips, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulier v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Vanessa Miree Mays
Represented By: Molly E. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sulier
Represented By: Randall E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?