23 Corporate Holdings, LLC v. The Douglas Company
Plaintiff: 23 Corporate Holdings, LLC
Defendant: The Douglas Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11098
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Striking Stipulation (Dkt. 5). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION to Entry of Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by The Douglas Company (Trimble, J.) Modified on 5/7/2019 (Sandusky, K).
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Douglas Company served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Dunn, Stephen)
April 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *The Douglas Company* (DWor)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by 23 Corporate Holdings, LLC against The Douglas Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7198954 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement) (Dunn, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 23 Corporate Holdings, LLC v. The Douglas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 23 Corporate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Douglas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?