LaTorre et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Arkendia Williams, Robin LaTorre and Patricia Anderson
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11100
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 7/29/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (MacKay, K)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Danielle Naiman Kohn on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Kohn, Brittney)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Hassan A. Zavareei on behalf of Patricia Anderson, Robin LaTorre, Arkendia Williams. (Zavareei, Hassan)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading. (Responsive Pleading due by 6/27/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, and General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. McKeever on behalf of General Motors LLC. (McKeever, Susan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Sooy on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Sooy, Kathleen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors LLC served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Miller, E.)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Linda V. Parker. (NAhm)
April 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors LLC* (DWor)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kalas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kalas, William)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against General Motors LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7199539 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Poor Headlight Visibility, Carcomplaints.com, #3 Exhibit 2-Headlights Problems of Cadillac SRX part 1, carproblemszoo.com, #4 Exhibit 3-Water in Lights, Carcomplaints.com, #5 Exhibit 4-Cadillac,The All-New 2010 SRX Crossover, #6 Exhibit 5-Cadillac,The 2011SRX Crossover, #7 Exhibit 6-Cadillac,The 2012 Cadillac SRX, #8 Exhibit 7-Cadillac, 2015 SRX) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaTorre et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkendia Williams
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin LaTorre
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Anderson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Brittney Danielle Naiman Kohn
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Susan M. McKeever
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?