Sirhan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: DAVID SIRHAN
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11108
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Downey, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/26/2019 at 3:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Sirhan Policies) (Downey, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L Zeman on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Zeman, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Phillips, Randall)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson in Room 1051. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Downey, Brian)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Downey, Brian)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Downey on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Downey, Brian)
April 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company* (DWor)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF THE EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME ACT OF 1974; INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF; PRE-JUDGMENT AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS filed by DAVID SIRHAN against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7200271 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: WAYNE - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: Eastern District of Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Phillips, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sirhan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua L Zeman
Represented By: Brian P. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SIRHAN
Represented By: Randall E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?