Bar Processing Corporation v. Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP
Plaintiff: Bar Processing Corporation
Defendant: Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv11120
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP. (Murkowski, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Lennon, Edward)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Lennon, Edward)
April 23, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Bar Processing Corporation - Receipt No. DET122088 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP* (BHan)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm)
April 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 4/26/2019 (SKra)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bar Processing Corporation against Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Hamilton. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC, 18-12691, Judge Friedman] (Lennon, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bar Processing Corporation v. Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP
Represented By: Robert E. Murkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bar Processing Corporation
Represented By: Edward G. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?