Allinger et al v. Walbridge et al
Plaintiff: Focus Management Services and Amos Orion Allinger
Defendant: Walbridge Enterprises, Staci Lynn Walbridge and Mount Morris Mobile Home Park
Case Number: 2:2019cv11130
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 COPY of #5 Order mailed to Amos Orion Allinger and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 COPY of #4 Notice mailed to Focus Management Services and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 COPY of #4 Notice mailed to Amos Orion Allinger and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
April 30, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Dismissing Case on Amos Orion Allinger at 2198 E. Mount Morris Road, Mount Morris, MI 48458. (TMcg)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Application to Proceed #2 In Forma Pauperis and DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Amos Orion Allinger. (DPer)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amos Orion Allinger, Focus Management Services against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allinger et al v. Walbridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Focus Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Orion Allinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walbridge Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staci Lynn Walbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Morris Mobile Home Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?