United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sredich

Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Kimberly Sredich
Case Number: 2:2019cv11140
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
2 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
3 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Kimberly Sredich* (SKra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kimberly Sredich by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hancur, Sarah)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Hancur, Sarah)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (SSch)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kimberly Sredich served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Hancur, Sarah)
April 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Kimberly Sredich* (SKra)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Hancur on behalf of Securities & Exchange Commission. (Hancur, Sarah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securities & Exchange Commission against Kimberly L. Sredich with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan (Flint), 4:19-cr-20230-LJM-SDD, Judge Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis] (Birkenheier, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sredich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Sredich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John E. Birkenheier
Represented By: Sarah E. Hancur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?