joachim v. Johnson & Johnson Company et al
Plaintiff: Donna joachim
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Meijer
Case Number: 2:2019cv11142
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Remand, and #7 MOTION re #6 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit Exhibit P, #9 Exhibit Exhibit Q) (Ministrelli, Jason)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Gostek, Katharine)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal re #2 Addendum, #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson Company (Gostek, Katharine)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal filed by Johnson & Johnson Company. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION re #6 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Ministrelli, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits INDEX OF EXHIBITS, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, #11 Document Continuation CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Ministrelli, Jason)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT A to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,, #4 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal by Johnson & Johnson Company (Gostek, Katharine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal by Johnson & Johnson Company. (Gostek, Katharine)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Donna joachim (Goodman, Philip) Modified on 5/3/2019 (SOso). [Document titled PLAINTIFFS RULE 9027(E)(3) STATEMENT]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 ADDENDUM re #1 Notice of Removal,, Part 2 of Exhibit C4 by Johnson & Johnson Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Gostek, Katharine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit, case number 18-014392-NP. Receipt No: 0645-7204931 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C 1A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C 1B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C2, C3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Gostek, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: joachim v. Johnson & Johnson Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Represented By: Katharine Gostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Dale R. Burmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Katharine Gostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer
Represented By: Erika Pamela Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna joachim
Represented By: Jason M. Ministrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?