IDS Property Casualty Ins. Co. v Kingstson Brass Inc.
Plaintiff: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Kingston Brass, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11148
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Correction re #11 Scheduling Order,. (DTof)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: FACILITATION INFORMATION DUE 2/3/2020; Fact Discovery due by 2/3/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/4/2020 - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/26/2019) (DTof).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: FACILITATION INFORMATION DUE 2/14/2019; Fact Discovery due by 3/16/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/19/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof)
June 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 06/19/2019 is Cancelled (DTof)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Saber, Marisa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 6/17/2019; Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2019 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Kingston Brass, Inc.. (Cooney, Henry)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Financial Inc Ameriprise for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Saber, Marisa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Proof of Service on Defendant, Kingston, served with Summons and Complaint on April 24, 2019 (Saber, Marisa)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company against Kingston Brass, Inc.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Saber, Marisa)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Strike 1 Complaint filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Kingston Brass, Inc.* (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IDS Property Casualty Ins. Co. v Kingstson Brass Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marisa L. Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Brass, Inc.
Represented By: Henry B. Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?