Rasawehr v. Belcher et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery E. Rasawehr
Defendant: Eric L. Belcher, David E. Flack and Martin D. Ford
Case Number: 2:2019cv11153
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Jeffery E. Rasawehr. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Original Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 Jeff Rasawehr Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 Motion to Permit Recording, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 Unpublished Case - Ruby, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 Unpublished Case - Cobasys) (Ajlouny, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Eric L. Belcher, David E. Flack, Martin D. Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C) (Schwartz, Nicholas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Schwartz on behalf of All Defendants. (Schwartz, Nicholas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Dolenga on behalf of All Defendants. (Dolenga, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Martin D. Ford served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Ajlouny, Jonathan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David E. Flack served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Ajlouny, Jonathan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eric L. Belcher served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Ajlouny, Jonathan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ian M. Williamson appearing on behalf of Jeffery E. Rasawehr (Williamson, Ian)
April 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Martin D. Ford* (DWor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *David E. Flack* (DWor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Eric L. Belcher* (DWor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeffery E. Rasawehr against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7206263 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Auglaize. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Original Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit Unit Purchase Flack, #4 Exhibit Unit Purchase Holsapple, #5 Exhibit Unit Purchase Holsapple, #6 Exhibit Co-Bank Letter, #7 Exhibit Email, #8 Exhibit Bear Packaging Articles, #9 Exhibit Carbon Growers Articles, #10 Exhibit Email, #11 Exhibit Financial Statements, #12 Exhibit Email) (Ajlouny, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasawehr v. Belcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery E. Rasawehr
Represented By: Ian M. Williamson
Represented By: Jonathan Nabeel Ajlouny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Belcher
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Flack
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin D. Ford
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?