Public Lighting Authority of Detroit v. Leotek Electronics USA LLC
Plaintiff: Public Lighting Authority of Detroit
Defendant: Leotek Electronics USA LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11327
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles N. Raimi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Raimi, Charles)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Public Lighting Authority of Detroit served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Campbell, Kevin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luis E. Gomez appearing on behalf of Public Lighting Authority of Detroit (Gomez, Luis)
May 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Leotek Electronics USA LLC* (NAhm)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Public Lighting Authority of Detroit against Leotek Electronics USA LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7228159 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Santa Clara. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Campbell, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public Lighting Authority of Detroit v. Leotek Electronics USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leotek Electronics USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Lighting Authority of Detroit
Represented By: Kevin J. Campbell
Represented By: Luis E. Gomez
Represented By: Charles N. Raimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?