Al-Jazrawi v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Summit Neuromonitoring LLC (Dr. Anwar Malik), ISpine (Dr. Stefan G. Pribil), Advanced Surgery Center PLLC, Zinah Al-Jazrawi, Detroit Institute of Pain & Muscleskeltal Medicine (Dr. Bachu Abraham) and Medcare Wellness LLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11363
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company 2nd Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plalintiff's Dep Transcript, #4 Exhibit Florida Corp. Rpt - ISpine, #5 Exhibit Det Inst of Pain & Muscleskeltal Med Lara Rpt, #6 Exhibit Summit - Maryland Corp Record Search & Anwar Malik Rpt, #7 Exhibit Adv'd Surg Lara Rpt, #8 Exhibit Adv'd Surg Member Voter Reg, #9 Exhibit Medcare Wellness Lara Rpt, #10 Exhibit Stefan Pribil Pers Info Rpt, #11 Exhibit Bachu Abraham Voter Reg, #12 Exhibit Proof of Svc-Summons & Complaint, #13 Exhibit Answer Package, #14 Exhibit Det Inst of Pain Articles of Organization, #15 Exhibit Komol Malik Domicile Information) (Wright, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Plainitff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Dep Transcript, #4 Exhibit Florida Corp. Report - ISpine, #5 Exhibit Det Inst of Pain & Muscleskeltal Med Lara Rpt, #6 Exhibit Summit Neuromonitoring Corp Record & Malik Report, #7 Exhibit Adv'd Surgery Center Lara Report, #8 Exhibit Adv'd Surgery Center Voter Reg, #9 Exhibit Medcare Wellness Lara Report, #10 Exhibit Stefan Pribil Personal Info Report, #11 Exhibit Bachu Abraham Voter Reg, #12 Exhibit Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, #13 Exhibit Answer Package) (Wright, Brian)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant's ex parte motion to extend time to respond to order to show cause (Dkt. #4 ) is granted. Defendant shall file its response to the Court's order (Dkt. #3 ) on or before June 3, 2019.SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email to counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Vacation Request) (Wright, Brian)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wright, Brian)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-003455-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7231975 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: Wayne County Circuit Court+, 17-008167-NF, Judge Martha Snow] [Possible companion case(s): 15th Judicial District Court, 17-3515-GC, Judge Joseph Burke] (Wright, Brian)
May 8, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs ISpine (Dr. Stefan G. Pribil), Detroit Institute of Pain & Muscleskeltal Medicine (Dr. Bachu Abraham), Summit Neuromonitoring LLC (Dr. Anwar Malik), Advanced Surgery Center PLLC, Medcare Wellness LLC. Reason: Party name not added when initiating case. (Wright, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Jazrawi v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Neuromonitoring LLC (Dr. Anwar Malik)
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISpine (Dr. Stefan G. Pribil)
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Surgery Center PLLC
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zinah Al-Jazrawi
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detroit Institute of Pain & Muscleskeltal Medicine (Dr. Bachu Abraham)
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medcare Wellness LLC
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?