HealthCall of Detroit, Inc. v. Farmers Insurance Exchange

Plaintiff: HealthCall of Detroit, Inc.
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Case Number: 2:2019cv11406
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Hewson, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmative Defenses, #2 Document Continuation Reliance on Jury Demand) (Hewson, James) Modified on 6/21/2019 (SKra).[WRONG CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION and ORDER denying Defendant's #4 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (NAhm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 [WRONG CASE # ON MOTION] MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hewson, James) Modified on 6/7/2019 (LGra).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Farmers Insurance Exchange served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Green, Jennifer)
May 14, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Farmers Insurance Exchange* (SOso)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HealthCall of Detroit, Inc. against Farmers Insurance Exchange with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7236268 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Los Angeles. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 2:16-cv-11345, Judge Bernard A. Friedman] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice Package, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Benefits) (Green, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HealthCall of Detroit, Inc. v. Farmers Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: James F. Hewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HealthCall of Detroit, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer K. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?