Smith v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11443
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/2/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/30/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
July 11, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference Hearing on July 22, 2019 is Cancelled re #3 Notice to Appear. (LSau)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Acker, Laurence)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company (O'Donnell, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (O'Donnell, Mary)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Smith against Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7241691 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Shiawassee - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Robert B. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?