Caudle v. Hard Drive Express, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Caudle
Defendant: Hard Drive Express, Inc. and James Betz
Case Number: 2:2019cv11445
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED #6 Answer to Complaint by Hard Drive Express, Inc. Amended Affirmative Defenses (Vining, Guy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Champa on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Champa, Judith)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance on Jury Demand by James Betz, Hard Drive Express, Inc.. (Vining, Guy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Guy C. Vining appearing on behalf of James Betz, Hard Drive Express, Inc. (Vining, Guy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Betz served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Mack, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hard Drive Express, Inc. (Vining, Guy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *James Betz* (LGra)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance on Jury Demand by Hard Drive Express, Inc.. (Vining, Guy)
June 10, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Steven Caudle, Defendant James Betz. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #5 Amended Complaint Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Flynn, Keith)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Flynn, Keith)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Guy C. Vining appearing on behalf of Hard Drive Express, Inc. (Vining, Guy)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hard Drive Express, Inc. served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Flynn, Keith)
May 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Hard Drive Express, Inc.* (DWor)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Steven Caudle against Hard Drive Express, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7241910 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Frederick - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Flynn, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudle v. Hard Drive Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Caudle
Represented By: Keith D. Flynn
Represented By: Judith A. Champa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Drive Express, Inc.
Represented By: Guy C. Vining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Betz
Represented By: Guy C. Vining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?