Johnson-Gault v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Johnson-Gault
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Technology Resource Group L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11446
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Technology Resource Group L.L.C.. (Norris, Megan)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Demetrius Johnson-Gault. Response due by 7/3/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Technology Resource Group L.L.C. identifying Other Affiliate Chubb Group of Insurance Companies for Technology Resource Group L.L.C.. (Norris, Megan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan P. Norris on behalf of Technology Resource Group L.L.C.. (Norris, Megan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica B. Pask on behalf of Technology Resource Group L.L.C.. (Pask, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US LLC. (Bretz, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by FCA US LLC. (Bretz, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Technology Resource Group L.L.C. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Fagan, Barry)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Fagan, Barry)
May 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Technology Resource Group L.L.C.* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Demetrius Johnson-Gault against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7242176 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Fagan, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson-Gault v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Johnson-Gault
Represented By: Barry S. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Resource Group L.L.C.
Represented By: Jessica B. Pask
Represented By: Megan P. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?