Michigan Head & Spine Institute, P.C. v. GEICO Indemnity Co.
Plaintiff: Michigan Head & Spine Institute, P.C.
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11489
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER PHASE I: Discovery due by 5/1/2020; Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LVer)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2019. (LVer)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (McNeely, Kevin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Michigan Head & Spine Institute, P.C. Plaintiff's Reliance on Jury Demand (McNeely, Kevin)
June 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details and dates) (LVer)
June 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Satisfying Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GEICO Indemnity Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Order to Show Cause) (Holland, Timothy)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by GEICO Indemnity Co.. (Holland, Timothy)
May 21, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Indemnity Co. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-172196-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7248822 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint) (Holland, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan Head & Spine Institute, P.C. v. GEICO Indemnity Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Head & Spine Institute, P.C.
Represented By: Kevin A. McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Timothy A. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?