Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. II d/b/a Great Lakes Caring v. Deary
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. II d/b/a Great Lakes Caring
Defendant: Cheri Lyn Deary
Case Number: 2:2019cv11502
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Response due by 7/31/2019, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Determination of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Cheri Lyn Deary. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: #3 MOTION to Dismiss is MOOT, per Amended Complaint filed 6/17/2019. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Cheri Lyn Deary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6) (Knapp, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First filed by Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. II d/b/a Great Lakes Caring against Cheri Lyn Deary. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Sims, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sims, David)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Determination of #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cheri Lyn Deary. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samantha A. Pattwell appearing on behalf of Cheri Lyn Deary (Pattwell, Samantha)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Cheri Lyn Deary. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Knapp, Scott)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Sims on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sims, David)
May 22, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cheri Lyn Deary from Circuit Court for the County of Jackson, case number 19-1836-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7250246 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Knapp, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. II d/b/a Great Lakes Caring v. Deary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Great Lakes Acquisition Corp. II d/b/a Great Lakes Caring
Represented By: Robert J. Finkel
Represented By: David E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Lyn Deary
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Represented By: Samantha A. Pattwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?