Sande v. Masco Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Christopher L. Sande
Defendant: Renee Straber and Masco Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11511
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Stipulated Order Regarding Responsive Pleading Deadline. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher L. Sande against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Laughbaum, Carol)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Masco Corporation waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Renee Straber waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Yourchock, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Masco Corporation, Renee Straber (Yourchock, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kimberly A. Yourchock appearing on behalf of Masco Corporation, Renee Straber and Certificate of Service (Yourchock, Kimberly)
May 23, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Renee Straber* (DWor)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Masco Corporation* (DWor)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by Christopher L. Sande against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7250998 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Laughbaum, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sande v. Masco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Straber
Represented By: Kimberly A. Yourchock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masco Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly A. Yourchock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Sande
Represented By: Carol A. Laughbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?