Flagstar Bank FSB v. Hild
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank FSB
Defendant: Michael C Hild and Live Well Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11512
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 12:1725
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2019. (Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) (JMcC)
September 6, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 9/10/2019 03:30 PM (time change only) before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel L. Estenson appearing on behalf of Michael C Hild (Estenson, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Shannon, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Staying Proceedings as to Defendant Live Well Financial, Inc., Only. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Live Well Financial, Inc. by Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order For Relief in an Involuntary Case, #2 Exhibit B - Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual) (Shannon, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Michael C Hild. (Corpus, Kathleen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended and Restated Complaint filed by Flagstar Bank FSB against Michael C Hild, Live Well Financial, Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Tab 1, Mortgage Warehouse Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit Tab 2, Mortgage Warehouse Note, #4 Exhibit Tab 3, Bond-Secured Credit Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit Tab 4, Bond-Secured Credit Facility Note, #6 Exhibit Tab 5, Guaranty, #7 Exhibit Tab 6, Demand Letter) (Shannon, Joseph)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Flagstar Bank FSB identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. for Flagstar Bank FSB. (Shannon, Joseph)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jane D. Quasarano appearing on behalf of Flagstar Bank FSB (Quasarano, Jane)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael C Hild* (DWor)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Flagstar Bank FSB against Michael C Hild. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7251196 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Shannon, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagstar Bank FSB v. Hild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C Hild
Represented By: Kathleen S. Corpus
Represented By: Samuel L. Estenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Well Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank FSB
Represented By: Joseph J. Shannon, III
Represented By: Jane D. Quasarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?