ICS North America Corp v. Collage.Com, Inc.
Plaintiff: ICS North America Corp
Defendant: Collage.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11521
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING on #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff ICS North America Corp.'s Complaint for Money Damages and Declaratory Relief. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff ICS North America Corp.'s Complaint for Money Damages and Declaratory Relief by Collage.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Quick, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #7 Corrected Complaint filed by ICS North America Corp. Response due by 7/15/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 [COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY RELIEF] AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Corrected Complaint using 14 font filed by ICS North America Corp against Collage.Com, Inc.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Wagoner, Gregory) Modified on 6/27/2019 (LGra).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Quick on behalf of Collage.Com, Inc.. (Quick, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Collage.Com, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Wagoner, Gregory)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RE-FILE COMPLAINT by 5/31/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ICS North America Corp (Wagoner, Gregory)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Collage.Com, Inc.* (DWor)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ICS North America Corp against Collage.Com, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7253045 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cabarrus Cty., NC - County Where Action Arose: several counties in district - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston Cty., MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wagoner, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ICS North America Corp v. Collage.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collage.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel D. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICS North America Corp
Represented By: Gregory H. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?