Davco Industries Ltd. v. RLT and Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Davco Industries Ltd.
Defendant: RLT and Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11580
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT as to RLT and Associates, Inc. (DWor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to RLT and Associates, Inc. in the amount of $ 99,361.90 by Davco Industries Ltd.. (Grieco, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *RLT and Associates, Inc.* (ATee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RLT and Associates, Inc. by Davco Industries Ltd.. (Grieco, Jennifer)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. RLT and Associates, Inc. served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Grieco, Jennifer)
May 30, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *RLT and Associates, Inc.* (DAll)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Smith on behalf of Davco Industries Ltd.. (Smith, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Davco Industries Ltd. against RLT and Associates, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7259199 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ontario, Canada - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Grieco, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davco Industries Ltd. v. RLT and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davco Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew D. Smith
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLT and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?