LinTech Global, Inc. v. CAN Softtech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LinTech Global, Inc.
Defendant: Swapna Reddygari and CAN Softtech, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11600
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION and ORDER (1) Denying Defendants' #11 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(B)(2) and (2) Denying Transfer. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Motion Hearing Not Held on #10 Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court will issue a new date at a later time. (MacKay, K)
June 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Transfer Case . Disposition: Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (RLou)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Work - 2017, #3 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Work - 2019) (Hindelang, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LinTech Global, Inc.. (Boutrous, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Swapna Reddygari) (Pauwels, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by LinTech Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Declaration of Michael Lin, #3 Exhibit A-1 Emails between Michael Lin and Swapna Reddygari, #4 Exhibit A-2 Sample emails between Michael Lin and Swapna Reddygari, #5 Exhibit A-3 mails between Michael Lin and CAN Softtech, Inc., #6 Exhibit A-4 Sample emails between Michael Lin and CAN Softtech, Inc., #7 Exhibit B. Declaration of Reagan Blanton, #8 Exhibit B-1 Sample emails between Reagan Blanton and Swapna Reddygari, #9 Exhibit C. Declaration of Andre Randolph, #10 Exhibit C-1 Sample emails between Andre Randolph and Swapna Reddygari, #11 Exhibit D. Indefinite Delivery Indefinite Quantity Agreement, #12 Exhibit E. LinTechs Time-And-Material, Labor-Hour General Provisions) (Boutrous, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case. Response due by 6/11/2019, Reply due by 6/14/2019, Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Response due by 6/11/2019, Reply due by 6/14/2019, Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Swapna Reddygari, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summons) (Pauwels, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LinTech Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Order) (Boutrous, James)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 31, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark William Steiner on behalf of LinTech Global, Inc.. (Steiner, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LinTech Global, Inc. (Boutrous, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LinTech Global, Inc. (Boutrous, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Boutrous, II on behalf of LinTech Global, Inc.. (Boutrous, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E. Biery on behalf of All Defendants. (Biery, Laura)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by CAN Softtech, Inc. (Pauwels, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Pauwels on behalf of All Defendants. (Pauwels, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-174161-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7261683 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hindelang, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LinTech Global, Inc. v. CAN Softtech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swapna Reddygari
Represented By: Michael P. Hindelang
Represented By: Laura E. Biery
Represented By: Andrew M. Pauwels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAN Softtech, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Hindelang
Represented By: Laura E. Biery
Represented By: Andrew M. Pauwels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LinTech Global, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Boutrous, II
Represented By: Mark William Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?