P.A.L. Environmental Safety Corp. v. North American Dismantling Corp. et al
Plaintiff: P.A.L. Environmental Safety Corp.
Defendant: North American Dismantling Corp., North American Specialty Insurance Company and Consumers Energy Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11630
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO APPEAR: the Status Conference previously set on 7/29/2019 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow is hereby adjourned. The Status Conference is re-scheduled at 2:00 p.m. on 8/5/2019 before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (McColley, N)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 8/7/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2019 03:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consumers Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent CMS Energy Corporation for Consumers Energy Company. (Fisk, Kristina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 COUNTERCLAIM filed by North American Dismantling Corp. against P.A.L. Environmental Safety Corp. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit B - Proposal, #4 Exhibit C - Subcontract Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Subcontract Agreement) (Boettcher, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by North American Dismantling Corp.. (Boettcher, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by North American Specialty Insurance Company (Frank, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Omar J. Harb appearing on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Harb, Omar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Frank, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Consumers Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Wetherby, Angela)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. North American Dismantling Corp. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Hendrick, Kevin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Inosencio, Jr on behalf of Consumers Energy Company. (Inosencio, Bruce)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina M. Fisk on behalf of Consumers Energy Company. (Fisk, Kristina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela C. Wetherby on behalf of Consumers Energy Company. (Wetherby, Angela)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
June 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by P.A.L. Environmental Safety Corp. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7265180 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Long Island City - County Where Action Arose: Lapeer - County of 1st Defendant: Lapeer. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hendrick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.A.L. Environmental Safety Corp. v. North American Dismantling Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A.L. Environmental Safety Corp.
Represented By: Kevin S. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Dismantling Corp.
Represented By: Matthew J. Boettcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Frank
Represented By: Omar J. Harb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Energy Company
Represented By: Kristina M. Fisk
Represented By: Bruce A. Inosencio, Jr.
Represented By: Angela C. Wetherby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?