Hoover v. Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs
Plaintiff: Sherry Hoover
Defendant: Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs
Case Number: 2:2019cv11656
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response in Oppositon to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Certificate of Service filed by Sherry Hoover. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit 1. Janusary 16, 2019 Resolution for Patient Access, #3 Exhibit 2. Waiver Consent Form) (Donovan, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED ORDER Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss :( Response due by 7/24/2019, Reply due by 8/7/2019) Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2019 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sherry Hoover Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Jason Crockett re #21 Affidavit Amended by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Jason Crockett by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Jacob Abraham by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Gerald Millen by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Angela D. Roullier by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Amy McKinnon-Glun by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Sherry Hoover by Sherry Hoover (Donovan, Michelle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erika Noelle Marzorati appearing on behalf of Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs (Marzorati, Erika)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #8 Response to Motion,,, Plaintiff's Reply Brief to Def's Brief in Opp to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, etc. filed by Sherry Hoover. (Donovan, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sherry Hoover :( Reply due by 03:00 p.m. on 7/12/2019) Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 09:30 AM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 APPENDIX re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. by Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit App'x 1 - The Curing Corner v. Mich. Dep't of Licensing and Reg. Affairs (order dismissing), #2 Exhibit App'x 2 - The Curing Corner v. Mich. Dep't of Licensing and Reg. Affairs (order denying reconsideration), #3 Exhibit App'x 3 - Williams v. Mich. Bd. of Dentistry) (Booth, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 12/04/2017, #3 Exhibit B - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 5/30/2018, #4 Exhibit C - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 9/11/2018, #5 Exhibit D - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 10/01/2018, #6 Exhibit E - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Rules issued 11/27/2018, #7 Exhibit F - Medical Marihuana Licensing Board Resolution addopted 1/16/2019, #8 Exhibit G - Medical Marihuana Licensing Board Resolution adopted 3/21/2019) (Booth, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 APPENDIX re: #8 Response to Motion,,, filed by Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. by Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit App'x 1 - The Curing Corner v. Mich. Dep't of Licensing and Reg. Affairs (order dismissing), #2 Exhibit App'x 2 - The Curing Corner v. Mich. Dep't of Licensing and Reg. Affairs (order denying reconsideration), #3 Exhibit App'x 3 - Williams v. Mich. Bd. of Dentistry) (Booth, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 12/04/2017, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 5/30/2018, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 9/11/2018, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Emergency Rules issued 10/1/2018, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Medical Marihuana Facilities Licensing Act Rules issued 11/27/2018, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Medical Marihuana Licensing Board Resolution adopted 1/16/2019, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Medical Marihuana Licensing Board Resolution adopted 3/21/2019) (Booth, Joshua)
June 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/11/2019 (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Brya on behalf of Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. (Brya, Michelle)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua O. Booth on behalf of Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. (Booth, Joshua)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/11/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Donovan, Michelle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs* (LGra)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sherry Hoover. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Proposed Order to Show Cause and Granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Declaratory Judgment) (Donovan, Michelle)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sherry Hoover against Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7269736 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Affidavits) (Donovan, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover v. Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Hoover
Represented By: Michelle R.E. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs
Represented By: Erika Noelle Marzorati
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michelle M. Brya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?