Catholic Charities v. Michigan Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities
Defendant: Michigan Children's Services Agency, Dana Nessel, Michigan Department of Health and Human Services, Jennifer Wrayno and Gordon Robert
Intervenor Defendant: Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont
Case Number: 2:2019cv11661
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION Immediate Consideration re #38 MOTION to Expedite by All Defendants. (Harris, Toni)
February 20, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Expedite by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Index of Exhibits 6) (Harris, Toni)
January 21, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Harris, Toni)[NOTICE OF FILING] Modified on 1/21/2020 (DPer).
January 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Catholic Charities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- filing from Buck v. Gordon) (Galus, Jeremiah)
November 13, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response re #32 MOTION to Strike #30 Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other) filed by Catholic Charities. (Galus, Jeremiah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Strike #30 Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other) filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont. (Beeney, Garrard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Strike #30 Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other) filed by All Defendants. (Harris, Toni)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike #30 Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other) by Catholic Charities. (Galus, Jeremiah)
October 15, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont re #30 Notice (Other), #29 Notice (Other) (Beeney, Garrard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by All Defendants re #22 Response to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Harris, Toni)
September 27, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Catholic Charities (Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Galus, Jeremiah)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED ORDER Allowing Withdrawal of Attorney Joshua S. Smith. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MacKay, K)
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #20 MOTION to Intervene , #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel , #9 MOTION to Change Venue , #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (LSau)
August 21, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on August 21, 2019 is Cancelled. (LSau)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont. (Ostrager, Ann-Elizabeth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Catholic Charities. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Slater, #3 Exhibit Gay Marriage Fight is not in any way Similar to Civil Rights Movement, #4 Exhibit Q&A with Mich. Democratic Attorney General Candidate Dana Nessel, #5 Exhibit Faith-based adoption bills headed to House floor, #6 Exhibit Adoption law discriminates against gays, #7 Exhibit Opponents say adoption bill discriminates against gays and lesbians) (Galus, Jeremiah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Catholic Charities. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Facebook post, #3 Exhibit 2- Buck 07/31/19 Order, #4 Exhibit 3- Dumont Stipulation and Order, #5 Exhibit 4- Buck 06/12/19 Order) (Galus, Jeremiah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction [Proposed] filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A -- Dr. Brodzinsky Expert Report, #3 Exhibit B -- Sander Decl., #4 Exhibit C -- Special Investigation Report, #5 Exhibit D -- Special Investigation Report, #6 Exhibit E -- Dumont State Defendants' R&Os to RFAs, #7 Exhibit F -- NPR Article, #8 Exhibit G -- Fox2News Article, #9 Exhibit H -- Pridesource Article, #10 Exhibit I -- Associated Press Article, #11 Exhibit J -- World Wide Religious News Article, #12 Exhibit K -- BREATHEcast Article) (Ostrager, Ann-Elizabeth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Goad, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Hoover, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Neitman, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Bladen, #6 Exhibit E - New Hope Family Servs. v. Poole, #7 Exhibit F - Agrawal v. Montemagno, #8 Exhibit G - Miller v. Mich. Dept of Corr., #9 Exhibit H - Burke v. Ky. State Police, #10 Exhibit I - Brown v. Tennessee Dept of Labor and Workforce Dev., #11 Exhibit J - Shuttle Packaging Sys. v. Tsonakis) (Harris, Toni)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING on #20 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene by Kristy Dumont, Dana Dumont. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A -- Proposed Answer, #3 Exhibit B -- Kristy Dumont Decl., #4 Exhibit C -- Dana Dumont Decl.) (Ostrager, Ann-Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Change Venue , #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Motion Hearing reset for 8/21/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Preliminary Injunction Motion Briefing Deadlines and Hearing Date as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction :( Response due by 7/24/2019, Reply due by 8/7/2019, Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING on #9 MOTION to Change Venue , #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 03:45 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Catholic Charities. (Galus, Jeremiah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Smith, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by All Defendants. (Smith, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 03:45 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeremiah James Galus appearing on behalf of Catholic Charities (Galus, Jeremiah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Smith, Joshua)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Catholic Charities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Chris Slater) (Cortman, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Catholic Charities. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of John J. Bursch, #3 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Jeremiah Galus, #4 Exhibit 3- Declaration of David Cortman, #5 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Roger Brooks, #6 Exhibit 5- Declaration of James R. Wierenga) (Cortman, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by Catholic Charities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James Wierenga in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Chris Slater in Support) (Cortman, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David A. Cortman appearing on behalf of Catholic Charities (Cortman, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Smith, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs on behalf of All Defendants. (Briggs, Elizabeth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Precious Synott Boone on behalf of All Defendants. (Boone, Precious)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Notice of Appearance by All Defendants (Smith, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Smith on behalf of All Defendants. (Smith, Joshua)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, ( Response due by 6/28/2019) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Michigan Court of Claims, case number 19-000072-MM. Receipt No: 0645-7270966 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District Court of Michigan, USDC-ED 17-13080, Judge Paul Borman] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Harris, Toni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catholic Charities v. Michigan Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Children's Services Agency
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Joshua S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Joshua S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Joshua S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Wrayno
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Joshua S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Robert
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Joshua S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities
Represented By: James R. Wierenga
Represented By: Jeremiah James Galus
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Dana Dumont
Represented By: Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Garrard R. Beeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Kristy Dumont
Represented By: Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Garrard R. Beeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?