Pincast v. General RV Center et al

Plaintiff: Pincast
Defendant: General RV Center and Thor Motor Coach
Case Number: 2:2019cv11686
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Satisfying Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Defendants. (Dolenga, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2019. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Schwartz on behalf of General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach. (Schwartz, Nicholas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Dolenga on behalf of General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach. (Dolenga, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from Utah; Case Number 2:19-cv-00207. Modified on 6/6/2019 (VLun).
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Interdistrict Transfer Order to Eastern District of Michigan. Record transferred to receiving court electronically. All future documents should be filed in Eastern District of Michigan District Court. Case closed. (dla) [Transferred from utd on 6/6/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan filed by Defendants General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Transfer Venue to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mastrorocco, Jennifer) [Transferred from utd on 6/6/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court - Salt Lake County, case number 190901684, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3238341) filed by General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to United States District Court, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Mastrorocco, Jennifer) [Transferred from Utah; Case Number 2:19-cv-00207.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pincast v. General RV Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General RV Center
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pincast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?