Everest National Insurance Company v. Chamoun

Plaintiff: Everest National Insurance Company
Defendant: Kamiran Chamoun
Case Number: 2:2019cv11700
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Kamiran Chamoun* (DWor)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun M.-J. Neal for Entry of Default by Everest National Insurance Company (Neal, Shaun) Modified on 7/30/2019 (DWor). [WRONG EVENT SELECTED - DOCUMENT ENTITLED "REQUEST AND APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT"]
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Neal, Shaun) Modified on 7/15/2019 (ATee). [CORRECTED]
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Neal, Shaun)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Everest Re Group, Ltd. (Bermuda) for Everest National Insurance Company. (Neal, Shaun)
June 10, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Kamiran Chamoun* (SKra)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7274786 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Neal, Shaun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everest National Insurance Company v. Chamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Shaun M.J. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamiran Chamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?