Simply Bright Ideas, Inc. v. Worth Investment Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Simply Bright Ideas, Inc.
Defendant: Worth Capital, LLC, Worth Investment Group, LLC, Worth Holdings, LLC and Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11718
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Vacating #5 Order to Show Cause Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Regarding Venue by Simply Bright Ideas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Worth Investment Webpage re Company, #3 Exhibit B - Worth Investment Webpage re: Qualite, #4 Exhibit C - Worth Investment Webpage re Management) (Shinn, Jason)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Simply Bright Ideas, Inc. to Show Cause why this case should not be transferred to the Western District of Michigan and if not, why venue is proper in this District. Show Cause Response due by 7/10/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC, Worth Capital, LLC, Worth Holdings, LLC, Worth Investment Group, LLC (Miglio, Terrence)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Miglio, Terrence)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC, Worth Capital, LLC, Worth Holdings, LLC, Worth Investment Group, LLC* (SKra)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Simply Bright Ideas, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7276333 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: St. Charles, MO - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C - Job Award Announcement) (Shinn, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simply Bright Ideas, Inc. v. Worth Investment Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Capital, LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simply Bright Ideas, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?