K&N Events, LLC v. NZ Marketing & Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: K&N Events, LLC
Defendant: Neal Zipser and NZ Marketing & Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11731
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Janette E. Frank on behalf of All Defendants. (Frank, Janette)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER Extending The Response Dates to #12 Amended Complaint and #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ( Responses due by 7/22/2019.) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (MacKay, K)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Frank on behalf of All Defendants. (Frank, Jonathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by K&N Events, LLC against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Statement of Citizenship, #3 Exhibit Assumed Business Name Certificate, #4 Exhibit 2013 License Agreement, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Gottschalk, #6 Exhibit Email between Williams-Prades and Sand, #7 Exhibit Email with Carolina Hurricanes Foundation, #8 Exhibit Cease and Desist letter, #9 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt) (Huige, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Vacating #5 Order to Show Cause filed by K&N Events, LLC. Amended Complaint is due by 6/24/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (ECF No. 5) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration and statement of citizenship, #3 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint) (Huige, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Huige, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by All Plaintiffs . (Huige, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Neal Zipser* (LGra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *NZ Marketing & Communications, Inc.* (LGra)
June 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (MacKay, K)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and permanent injunction - Amended Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit License Agreement, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Gottschalk, #4 Exhibit Cease and Desist letter) (Huige, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and permanent injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit License Agreement, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Gottschalk, #4 Exhibit Assumed name certificate, #5 Exhibit Tower Lighting event website, #6 Exhibit SCCS Events website, #7 Exhibit Email with Carolina Hurricanes Foundations, #8 Exhibit Canes Bash website, #9 Exhibit Joy Prom website, #10 Exhibit Cease and Desist letter, #11 Exhibit Good Time Photo Booth website excerpts) (Huige, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Hunter on behalf of K&N Events, LLC. (Hunter, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by K&N Events, LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7277432 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Assumed Business Name Certificate, #3 Exhibit August 6, 2013 License Agreement, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Gottschalk, #5 Exhibit October 8, 2018 email exchange, #6 Exhibit February 6, 2019 email exchange, #7 Exhibit March 12, 2019 cease and desist letter, #8 Exhibit Certified mail receipt) (Huige, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&N Events, LLC v. NZ Marketing & Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Zipser
Represented By: Janette E. Frank
Represented By: Jonathan B. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NZ Marketing & Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Janette E. Frank
Represented By: Jonathan B. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&N Events, LLC
Represented By: James J. Hunter
Represented By: Andrew J. Huige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?