Oliver v. FCA U.S., L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Defendant: John Does and FCA U.S., L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11738
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT by Anthony Oliver (DPer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (SSch)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA U.S., L.L.C.* (DPer)
July 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order on Anthony Oliver Pris. No. 2019040074 at Chatham County Detention Center, 1050 Carl Griffin Drive, Savannah, GA 31405. (TMcg)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the U. S. Marshal re #9 Letter. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by Anthony Oliver. (SSch)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Document Received from Anthony Oliver (SSch)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Relate case to MDL 2744 filed by FCA U.S., L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order, Oliver v. City of Pooler, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order, Oliver v. Luner) (Williams, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Relate case to MDL 2744 by Anthony Oliver. (SSch)
June 20, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint on Anthony Oliver at 1050 Carl Griffin Drive, Savannah, GA 31405. (TMcg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process. (TMcg)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Anthony Oliver. (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Oliver against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. FCA U.S., L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA U.S., L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?