General Dynamics Land Systems Inc. v. MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: General Dynamics Land Systems Inc.
Defendant: MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11748
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default and Certificate of Service filed by General Dynamics Land Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Blanket Purchase Agreement/Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Default and Demand for Performance, dated May 24, 2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Termination, dated June 11, 2018, #5 Exhibit 4 - Demand for Payment, dated April 10, 2019) (Schwartz, Stuart)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #8 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of K. Reinard) (Adams, Alari)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default JUDGMENT as to *MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.*. Reason: *a sum certain refers to s specific dollar amount stated in a contract or negotiable instrument, an invoice or bill. The Court does not have record of these documents* (DWor)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc. in the amount of $ 197,910.80 by General Dynamics Land Systems Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.* (DWor)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc. by General Dynamics Land Systems Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Schwartz, Stuart)
June 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.* (SKra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by General Dynamics Land Systems Inc. against MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7280736 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: New Castle County, DE - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Bedford County, PA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schwartz, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Dynamics Land Systems Inc. v. MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDL Manufacturing Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Alari K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Dynamics Land Systems Inc.
Represented By: Stuart M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?