Kittle v. America's Test Kitchen LP
Plaintiff: Steven Kittle
Defendant: America's Test Kitchen LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv11757
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Steven Kittle. Response due by 8/16/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Hannon on behalf of America's Test Kitchen LP. (Hannon, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Bejin on behalf of America's Test Kitchen LP. (Bejin, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. America's Test Kitchen LP served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Fraietta, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Hedin on behalf of Steven Kittle. (Hedin, Frank)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick Suciu, III on behalf of Steven Kittle. (Suciu, Nick)
June 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *America's Test Kitchen LP* (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven Kittle against America's Test Kitchen LP with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7282083 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Norfolk. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kittle v. America's Test Kitchen LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kittle
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Represented By: Frank S. Hedin
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Test Kitchen LP
Represented By: Thomas E. Bejin
Represented By: David W. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?