Steele v. American Honda Motor CO., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert W Steele
Defendant: American Honda Motor CO., Inc., John Doe Honda Dealership, Zeigler Imports, LLC, Zeigler Honda of Kalamazoo and Zeigler Honda
Case Number: 2:2019cv11778
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Correction re 17 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Wrong document image was associated. (JCur)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying defendant's #16 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Pl's Objection to Removal, Motion for Evidentiary Hearing as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Motion to Reinstate Case, and Motion to Remand Case by American Honda Motor CO., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. AHM Co. Inc.'s Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Pl's Objection to Removal, Motion for Evidentiary Hearing as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Motion to Reinstate Case, and Motion to Remand Case) (White, Boyd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Motion to Reinstate Case (Motion to Amend/Correct Order of Dismissal); Objections to Removal; Motion For Evidentiary Hearing as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction; and Motion to Remand Case filed by Robert W Steele. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 8/5/2019 Attorney Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 - 5/21/2019 Motion to Amend Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - 6/13/2019 Cardelli email) (Elsey, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #12 Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response and Reply Briefs re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Response due by 8/19/2019; Reply to Response due by 8/5/2019 #8 . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Response to Motion, by Robert W Steele (Elsey, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Response to Motion, by Robert W Steele. (Elsey, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Zeigler Imports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 Summons Issued for "John Doe Honda Dealership", #3 Exhibit 2 Letter Addressed to "Ziegler Honda" in Kalamazoo, Michigan) (White, Boyd)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Boyd White, III appearing on behalf of Zeigler Imports, LLC (White, Boyd)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #2 . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Motion to Reinstate Case (Motion to Amend/Correct Order of Dismissal); Objections to Removal; Motion For Evidentiary Hearing as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction; and Motion to Remand Case filed by American Honda Motor CO., Inc.. (White, Boyd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by American Honda Motor CO., Inc.. (White, Boyd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying as moot Defendant American Honda Motor Company's #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert W Steele. (Elsey, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert W Steele against American Honda Motor CO., Inc., Zeigler Imports, LLC. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Elsey, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Motion to Reinstate Case (Motion to Amend/Correct Order of Dismissal); Objections to Removal; Motion For Evidentiary Hearing as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction; and Motion to Remand Case by Robert W Steele. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 3/4/2019 Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 - John Doe Summons, #4 Exhibit 3 - 5/22/2019 Service on Zeigler Honda, #5 Exhibit 4 - 5/24/2019 Service on American Honda, #6 Exhibit 5 - Order of Dismissal for Non Service, #7 Exhibit 6 - Ex Parte Motion for Reinstatement, #8 Exhibit 7 - Removal, #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Rejection of proposed Order Reinstating Case) (Elsey, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by American Honda Motor CO., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Photo, #3 Exhibit 2- Kalamazoo City Code) (White, Boyd)
June 14, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Motor CO., Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 2019-003103-nz. Receipt No: 0645-7284617 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (White, Boyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. American Honda Motor CO., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor CO., Inc.
Represented By: Boyd White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Honda Dealership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeigler Imports, LLC
Represented By: Boyd White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeigler Honda of Kalamazoo
Represented By: Boyd White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeigler Honda
Represented By: Boyd White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Steele
Represented By: Robert R. Elsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?