Ray v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Louis Ray
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11808
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Alexander Levine on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Levine, Jared)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Sooy on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Sooy, Kathleen)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER striking proposed order. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time by General Motors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.1 (Proposed) Order to Consolidate Actions) (Douglas, Stephanie)[PROPOSED ORDER STRICKEN PER 07/25/19 ORDER] Modified on 7/25/2019 (DPer).
July 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing on Joint Motion to Consolidate and Scheduling Conference reset for 9/11/2019 at 1:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/28/2019 at 4:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by General Motors, LLC Notice Regarding Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Douglas, Stephanie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Gustafson on behalf of Louis Ray. (Gustafson, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Louis Ray. Answer or Response due by 8/5/2019. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time by General Motors, LLC (Douglas, Stephanie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kalas on behalf of Louis Ray. (Kalas, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Miller, E.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Lesser on behalf of Louis Ray. (Lesser, Natalie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Louis Ray. (Troutner, Melissa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Meltzer on behalf of Louis Ray. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors, LLC* (SKra)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Louis Ray. (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Louis Ray against General Motors, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7288506 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cv-11044, Judge David M. Lawson] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Press Release - GM Reports Another Strong Year of Earnings, #3 Exhibit B-Article - Shifting Into Higher Gear, #4 Exhibit C-Article - GMs 8L90 transmission makes news again, #5 Exhibit D-Article - Rev Up for Remans, #6 Exhibit E-2018 Limited Warranty and Owner Assistance Information, #7 Exhibit F-NHTSA - 2017 Chevrolet Silverado 1500, #8 Exhibit G-NHTSA - 2016 GMC Sierra 1500, #9 Exhibit H-Thread - Comprehensive 8 speed transmission, #10 Exhibit I-Thread- 2018 8 speed transmissions,, #11 Exhibit J-Thread - GMs 8L45 Cadillac Automatic Transmission, #12 Exhibit K-Thread - My own 8 speed problems & resolution, #13 Exhibit L-Blog - 2016 Sierra 8-Spd Issue, #14 Exhibit M-Thread - GM 8 speed transmission problems, #15 Exhibit N-Thread - NHTSA - Power Train Problems 2015 Chevrolet Corvette, #16 Exhibit O-Article - 2019 Chevrolet Silverado First Test: Pencils Down, #17 Exhibit P-PI Nos. PIP5337-PIP5337K, #18 Exhibit Q-TSB No. 16-NA-014, #19 Exhibit R-TSB No. 16-NA-175, #20 Exhibit S-Bulletin No. 14-07-30-001, #21 Exhibit T-TSB No. 18-NA-355, #22 Exhibit U-TSB No. 16-NA-019, #23 Exhibit V-TSB No. 16-NA-213) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Ray
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?