Duffy et al v. General Motors Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Baptist, Benjy Tompkins, Dennis Duffy, Michael Plafker, Richard Sullivan, Dennis Speerly and John Iasiello
Defendant: General Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11875
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Avern Cohn
2 Judge: David M Lawson
3 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Alexander Levine on behalf of General Motors, Inc.. (Levine, Jared)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Sooy on behalf of General Motors, Inc.. (Sooy, Kathleen)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER striking proposed order. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time by General Motors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - (Proposed) Order to Consolidate Actions) (Douglas, Stephanie)[PROPOSED ORDER STRICKEN PER 07/25/19 ORDER] Modified on 7/25/2019 (DPer).
July 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing on Joint Motion to Consolidate and Scheduling Conference reset for 9/11/2019 at 1:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/28/2019 at 4:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by General Motors, Inc. Notice to the Parties regarding Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Douglas, Stephanie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors, Inc.. (Douglas, Stephanie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Avern Cohn and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to District Judge David M. Lawson and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from Florida Southern; Case Number 9:18-cv-81726. Modified on 6/25/2019 (VLun).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying as moot 27 Motion for Leave to File Joint Scheduling Report Out of Time ; denying as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss #1 Complaint; granting 43 Motion to Transfer Venue; adopting Report and Recommendations re 55 Report and Recommendations; Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 6/25/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DE 43) re 43 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Memorandum in Support filed by General Motors Inc. Recommending that Defendant General Motors' Motion to Transfer be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 6/25/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against General Motors Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11251888, filed by John Iasiello, Daniel Baptist, Benjy Tompkins, Richard Sullivan, Dennis Duffy, Dennis Speerly, Michael Plafker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leopold, Theodore) [Transferred from Florida Southern; Case Number 9:18-cv-81726.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy et al v. General Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Baptist
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjy Tompkins
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Duffy
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Plafker
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Speerly
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Iasiello
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?