Canfornav Inc. v. TDE Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Canfornav Inc.
Defendant: TDE Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11906
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TDE Group USA, Inc. (Hauser, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TDE Group USA, Inc.. (Hauser, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due by 8/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: J. Christian Hauser appearing on behalf of TDE Group USA, Inc. (Hauser, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Canfornav Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Apelis, Markus)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Canfornav Inc. (Apelis, Markus)
June 27, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *TDE Group USA, Inc.* (SKra)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Canfornav Inc. against TDE Group USA, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7301258 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Quebec, Canada - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Charter Party, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Demurrage Calculation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Final Arbitration Award, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Letter of Indemnity, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Egypt Salt Group Claim Info, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Demand for Security, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Apelis, Markus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canfornav Inc. v. TDE Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canfornav Inc.
Represented By: Markus Edgars Apelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDE Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: J. Christian Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?