PNC Bank, a national banking association v. De Vor et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, a national banking association
Defendant: Hendrik De Vor, Hendrick De Vor, De Vor Crop and Manure LLC, De Vor Dairy Holdings LLC, De Vor Real Estate LLC and De Vor Dairy Farm LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11987
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by De Vor Real Estate LLC (Schofner, Keith)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by De Vor Crop and Manure LLC (Schofner, Keith)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by De Vor Dairy Farm LLC (Schofner, Keith)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by De Vor Dairy Holdings LLC (Schofner, Keith)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmative Defenses) (Schofner, Keith)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 8/2/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hendrik De Vor served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Jerabek, Marc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. De Vor Crop and Manure LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Jerabek, Marc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. De Vor Real Estate LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Jerabek, Marc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. De Vor Dairy Holdings LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Jerabek, Marc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. De Vor Dairy Farm LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Jerabek, Marc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Plaintiffs. (Jerabek, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Ammar on behalf of PNC Bank, a national banking association. (Ammar, Joseph)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Hendrik De Vor, De Vor Crop and Manure LLC, De Vor Dairy Farm LLC, De Vor Dairy Holdings LLC, De Vor Real Estate LLC* (SKra)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7308797 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland and/or Tuscola - County of 1st Defendant: Tuscola. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Jerabek, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, a national banking association v. De Vor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrik De Vor
Represented By: Keith A. Schofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick De Vor
Represented By: Keith A. Schofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Vor Crop and Manure LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Schofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Vor Dairy Holdings LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Schofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Vor Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Schofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Vor Dairy Farm LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Schofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, a national banking association
Represented By: Marc P. Jerabek
Represented By: Joseph M. Ammar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?