Swiger v. Rosette et al

Plaintiff: Nicole Marie Swiger
Defendant: Ted Whitford, Kenneth Rees, Tim McInerney and Joel Rosette
Case Number: 2:2019cv12014
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenneth Rees served on 8/1/2019. (Baskin, Henry) Modified on 8/13/2019 (DWor). [WRONG EVENT SELECTED - DOCUMENT IS A WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS]
July 10, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Tim McInerney, Kenneth Rees, Joel Rosette, Ted Whitford* (SKra)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Nicole Marie Swiger against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7312763 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: out-of-state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Baskin, Henry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicole Marie Swiger against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7312698 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: out-of-state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Baskin, Henry) Modified on 7/10/2019 (SKra).[WRONG DOCUMENT SELECTED WHEN FILING-EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swiger v. Rosette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Marie Swiger
Represented By: Henry Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Whitford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Rosette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?