TSFR Burger, LLC v. Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TSFR Burger, LLC
Defendant: Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC and Andrew Levy
Case Number: 2:2019cv12060
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Andrew Levy, Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC. (Grekin, Joseph)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Seal Agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant Starboard Group of Great Lakes. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION to Seal Agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant by Andrew Levy, Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC. (Grekin, Joseph)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal Agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant by Andrew Levy, Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC. (Grekin, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by TSFR Burger, LLC. (Abel, Jason)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Certificate of Service filed by TSFR Burger, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint) (Abel, Jason)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Plaintiff To Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 COUNTERCLAIM filed by All Defendants against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Grekin, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Grekin, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants (Grekin, Joseph)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit court, case number 19-008211-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7318479 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Grekin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSFR Burger, LLC v. Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starboard Group of Great Lakes, LLC
Represented By: Joseph K. Grekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Levy
Represented By: Joseph K. Grekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSFR Burger, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?