MEEMIC Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Heather and Paul Swaenepoel v. Shark Ninja Operations, LLC

Plaintiff: MEEMIC Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Heather and Paul Swaenepoel
Defendant: Shark Ninja Operations, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12061
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti : Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after March 6, 2020. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/6/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/20/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker, Jury Trial set for 9/15/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (BSau)
August 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2019. (BSau)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan REPORT by MEEMIC Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Heather and Paul Swaenepoel (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause filed by MEEMIC Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Heather and Paul Swaenepoel. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Shark Ninja Operations, LLC. (Milton, Lisa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR for Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Shark Ninja Operations, LLC (Milton, Lisa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Shark Ninja Operations, LLC. (Milton, Lisa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2019 Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Shark Ninja Operations, LLC (Milton, Lisa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shark Ninja Operations, LLC from Jackson County Circuit Court, case number 19-2353-NP. Receipt No: 0645-7318483 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Milton, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEEMIC Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Heather and Paul Swaenepoel v. Shark Ninja Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shark Ninja Operations, LLC
Represented By: Lisa T. Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEEMIC Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Heather and Paul Swaenepoel
Represented By: Andrew J. VanBronkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?