United States of America v. Danner
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dawn Danner
Case Number: 2:2019cv12069
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Request for Writ of Garnishment by USA, by United States of America (Hotz, Jacqueline)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST by United States of America for issuance of continuing writ of garnishment as to Dawn Danner and garnishee State of Michigan Department of Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Writ & Notice of Continuing Garnishment) (Hotz, Jacqueline)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued as to Dawn Danner. (DPer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Abstract of Judgment by United States of America as to Dawn Danner . (Hotz, Jacqueline)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, #2 Consent Judgment by United States of America (Hotz, Jacqueline)
July 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 15, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Consent Judgment mailed to Dawn Danner at 2180 S. Hill Rd., Milford, MI 48381. (BSau)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BSau)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against Dawn Danner. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreement for Pretrial Diversion) (Hotz, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Hotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?