Moss v. Loandepot.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Ms. Jessica Moss
Defendant: Loandepot.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12076
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT filed by Jessica Moss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Aikens, Carla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT filed by All Defendants. (Brook, Martin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Loandepot.com, LLC. (Brook, Martin)
August 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT by Jessica Moss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement with MMI) (Aikens, Carla)
August 10, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT 1 CORRECTED re #4 Response to Motion by Jessica Moss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Proposed Amended Complaint) (Aikens, Carla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Jessica Moss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement with Mortgage Master) (Aikens, Carla)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Loandepot.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Brook, Martin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Loandepot.com, LLC (Brook, Martin)
July 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Loandepot.com, LLC from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2019-002114-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7320627 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Peter Macdonald, #4 Exhibit 3 - 6-11-19 Admin. Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Brook, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Loandepot.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loandepot.com, LLC
Represented By: Martin C. Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Jessica Moss
Represented By: Carla D. Aikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?